No. 17-1471
Title:Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Petitioner
v.
George W. Jackson
Docketed:April 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1627)
   Decision Date:January 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 25, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 25, 2018.
May 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2018Brief of respondent George W. Jackson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2018Reply of petitioner Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 27 2018Petition GRANTED. In addition to the questions presented by the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following question: Should this Court's holding in Shamrock Oil & Gas Corp. v. Sheets, 313 U. S. 100 (1941)—that an original plaintiff may not remove a counterclaim against it—extend to third-party counterclaim defendants?

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah E. Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian William Warwick
    Counsel of Record
Varnell & Warwick, P.A.
P.O. Box 1870
Lady Lake, FL 32158

bwarwick@varnellandwarwick.com
352-753-8600
Party name: George W. Jackson
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Capital Appellate Advocacy PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
202-729-6337
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Laura Kathleen McNally
    Counsel of Record
Loeb & Loeb, LLP
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago, IL 60654

lmcnally@loeb.com
312-464-3155
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Archis Ashok Parasharami
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

aparasharami@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3328
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.