No. 17-1459
Title:World Programming Limited, Petitioner
v.
SAS Institute, Inc.
Docketed:April 23, 2018
Linked with 17A830
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1808, 16-1857)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 06 2018Application (17A830) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 20, 2018.
Feb 06 2018Application (17A830) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2018 to April 20, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Apr 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 23, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 23, 2018 to June 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 22, 2018.
May 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars and Practitioners filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2018Brief of respondent SAS Institute, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018Reply of petitioner World Programming Limited filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey A. Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
(202) 556-2000
Party name: World Programming Limited
Attorneys for Respondent
Pressly McAuley Millen
    Counsel of Record
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
555 Fayetteville Street
Suite 1100
Raleigh, NC 27601

press.millen@wbd-us.com
919-755-2135
Party name: SAS Institute, Inc.
Other
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
5123222506
Party name: Scholars and Practitioners