No. 17-1451
Title:Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's of London, Petitioner
v.
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver of Omni National Bank, et al.
Docketed:April 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16702)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Waiver of right of respondents Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, As Receiver Of Omni National Bank, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel McNeel Lane Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
300 Convent Street, Suite 2100
San Antonio, TX 78205

neel.lane@nortonrosefulbright.com
210-270-7170
Party name: Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's, London
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, As Receiver Of Omni National Bank