No. 17-1449
Title:Arizona, Petitioner
v.
Jasper Phillip Rushing
Docketed:April 19, 2018
Linked with 17A956
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-15-0268-AP)
   Decision Date:November 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2018Application (17A956) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 15, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 09 2018Application (17A956) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 16, 2018.
Apr 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 21, 2018 to June 20, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 07 2018Motion of Jasper Phillip Rushing for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (May 11, 2018)
May 07 2018Motion of Jasper Phillip Rushing for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (May 11, 2018)
May 08 2018Opposition to motion to extend the time to file a response filed.
Main Document
May 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 20, 2018.
Jun 19 2018Brief of respondent Jasper Phillip Rushing in opposition filed.
Main Document
Jun 19 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Jasper Phillip Rushing.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of ServiceOther
Jul 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 03 2018Reply of petitioner State of Arizona filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
2005 North Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
6025423333
Party name: State of Arizona
Attorneys for Respondent
Sharmila Roy
    Counsel of Record
Sharmila Roy Attorney at Law
P.O. Box 441
9307 S. 51st Avenue
Laveen, AZ 85339

legaleagle.roy@gmail.com
602-930-2690
Party name: Jasper Phillip Rushing