No. 17-1438
Title:Noble Energy, Inc., Petitioner
v.
ConocoPhillips Co.
Docketed:April 18, 2018
Linked with 17A856
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Texas
   Case Numbers:(15-502)
   Decision Date:June 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 15, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 09 2018Application (17A856) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 15, 2018 to April 16, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. (Justice Alito is recused.)
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Application (17A856) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 16, 2018.
Apr 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2018 to June 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 18, 2018.
May 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Plains All American Pipeline, L.P. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2018Brief of respondent ConocoPhillips Co. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Noble Energy, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Macey Reasoner Stokes
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
One Shell Plaza
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002-4995

macey.stokes@bakerbotts.com
713-229-1369
Party name: ConocoPhillips Co.
Other
D. M. Lynn
    Counsel of Record
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
420 Throckmorton St., Suite 1000
Fort Worth, TX 76102

michael.lynn@bondsellis.com
817-405-6900
Party name: Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.