No. 17-1398
Title:SWC, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
David A. Herr, et al.
Docketed:April 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2126)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2018 to June 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 6, 2018.
May 07 2018Brief of respondents David Herr, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 6, 2018 to July 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 6, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Howard A. Learner
    Counsel of Record
Environmental Law & Policy Center
35 East Wacker Drive
Suite 1600
Chicago, IL 60601

HLearner@elpc.org
312-673-6500
Party name: SWC, LLC, d/b/a Sylvania Wilderness Cabins, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Forest Service, et al.
William Perry Pendley
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
303-292-2021
Party name: David Herr, et al.