No. 17-1382 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Donnie Cleveland Lance, Petitioner
v.
Eric Sellers, Warden
Docketed:April 2, 2018
Linked with 17A759
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15008)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 31, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2018Application (17A759) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 30, 2018.
Jan 18 2018Application (17A759) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2018 to March 30, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2018Brief of respondent Eric Sellers, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2018Reply of petitioner Donnie Cleveland Lance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 01 2018Record Requested.
Jun 07 2018Record received from U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit and U.S.D.C. for the Northern District of Georgia. The record is electronic and available on PACER.
Jun 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
L. Joseph Loveland
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding, LLP
1180 Peachtree Street, NE
Atlanta, GA 30309

Ljloveland@gmail.com
404-572-4600
Party name: Donnie Cleveland Lance
Attorneys for Respondent
Patricia Beth Burton
    Counsel of Record
State Law Department
40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

bburton@law.ga.gov
404-656-3499
Party name: Eric Sellers, Warden