No. 17-1375 | |
Title: | Gerawan Farming, Inc., Petitioner v. Agricultural Labor Relations Board |
Docketed: | March 30, 2018 |
Linked with 17A839 | |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Numbers: | (S227243) |
Decision Date: | November 27, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 07 2018 | Application (17A839) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 25, 2018 to March 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Feb 08 2018 | Application (17A839) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until March 28, 2018. |
Mar 28 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 03 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Agricultural Labor Relations Board to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 03 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Real Party in Interest, United Farm Workers of America to respond filed. |
Apr 11 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. |
Apr 16 2018 | Response Requested. (Due May 16, 2018) |
Apr 27 2018 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The NFIB Small Business Legal Center and Southeastern Legal Foundation. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | |
May 01 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 04 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2018 to June 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 07 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 15, 2018. |
May 14 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Silvia Lopez filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 16 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Roberto Angeles, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 05 2018 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Gerawan Farming, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 15 2018 | Brief of respondent Agricultural Labor Relations Board in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 15 2018 | Brief of respondent United Farm Workers of America in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 03 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. |
Jul 03 2018 | Reply of petitioner Gerawan Farming, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 01 2018 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The NFIB Small Business Legal Center and Southeastern Legal Foundation GRANTED. |
Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Michael W. McConnell Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 655 Fifteenth Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20005 michael.mcconnell@kirkland.com | (202) 879-5000 |
Party name: Gerawan Farming, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Benjamin Matthew Glickman Counsel of Record | California Department of Justice 1300 I St., Suite 125, P.O. Box 944255 Sacramento, CA 94244 benjamin.glickman@doj.ca.gov | 9162106054 |
Party name: Agricultural Labor Relations Board | ||
Mario Martinez Counsel of Record | Martinez Aguilasocho & Lynch, APLC P.O. Box 1998 Bakersfield, CA 93303 mmartinez@farmworkerlaw.com | 661-859-1174 |
Party name: United Farm Workers of America | ||
Other | ||
Michael A. Carvin Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Ave., N.W. Washington, DC 20001 macarvin@jonesday.com | (202) 879-3939 |
Party name: Silvia Lopez | ||
Damien Michael Schiff Counsel of Record | Pacific Legal Foundation 930 G Street Sacramento, CA 95814 dschiff@pacificlegal.org | (916) 419-7111 |
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. | ||
Luke Anthony Wake Counsel of Record | NFIB Small Business Legal Center 1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200 Washington, DC 20004 luke.wake@nfib.org | 916-384-7648 |
Party name: The NFIB Small Business Legal Center and Southeastern Legal Foundation | ||
William James Young Counsel of Record | c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. 8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600 Springfield, VA 22160 wjy@nrtw.org | (703) 321-8510 |
Party name: Roberto Angeles, et al. |