No. 17-1354
Title:Erick Gelhaus, Petitioner
v.
Estate of Andy Lopez, By and Through Successors in Interest, Rodrigo Lopez and Sujay Cruz, et al.
Docketed:March 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15175)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 22, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2018Brief of respondents Estate of Andy Lopez, by and through successors in interest, Rodrigo Lopez and Sujay Cruz in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Peace Officers' Research Association of California, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Force Litigation Consulting LLC, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by California State Sheriffs' Association, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2018Reply of petitioner Erick Gelhaus filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: Erick Gelhaus
Attorneys for Respondent
Gerald Philip Peters
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Gerald Philip Peters
P.O. Box 6759
Thousand Oaks, CA 91359

Gerald.Peters@gmail.com
818-706-1278
Party name: Estate of Andy Lopez, by and through successors in interest, Rodrigo Lopez and Sujay Cruz
Other
Jennifer Bacon Henning
    Counsel of Record
County Counsels' Association of California
1100 K Street, Suite 101
Sacramento, CA 95814

jhenning@counties.org
916-327-7535
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Assoc and Calif State Assoc of Counties
John N. Maher
    Counsel of Record
Maher Legal Services PC
7 East Main Street
Number 1053
St. Charles, IL 60174

johnmaher@maherlegalservices.com
708-468-8155
Party name: Force Litigation Consulting LLC, et al.
Michael Logan Rains
    Counsel of Record
Rains Lucia Stern St. Phalle & Silver
2300 Contra Costa Blvd.
Suite 500
Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

lwelch@rlslawyers.com
925-609-1699
Party name: Peace Officers' Research Association of California, et al.
James R. Touchstone
    Counsel of Record
Jones & Mayer
3777 North Harbor Boulevard
Fullerton, CA 92835

jrt@jones-mayer.com
714-446-1400
Party name: California State Sheriffs' Association; California Police Chiefs Association; California Peace Officers' Association