No. 17-1353
Title:Fort Peck Housing Authority, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Housing and Urban Development, et al.
Docketed:March 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1407, 15-1060)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 26, 2018 to May 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2018.
May 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 11, 2018.
May 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2018 to July 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 11 2018Brief of respondents Department of Housing and Urban Development, et al. in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 15 2018Reply of petitioners Fort Peck Housing Authority, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Fredericks III
    Counsel of Record
Fredericks Peebles & Morgan LLP
1900 Plaza Dr
Louisville, CO 80027

jfredericks@ndnlaw.com
303-673-9600
Party name: Fort Peck Housing Authority, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Housing and Urban Development, et al.