No. 17-1351
Title:Rick Greer, Petitioner
v.
Green Tree Servicing LLC, et al.
Docketed:March 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-35691)
   Decision Date:December 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 26, 2018 to June 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2018.
May 21 2018Letter of May 21, 2018, from counsel for petitioner received.
Main Document
May 29 2018Brief of respondent Green Tree Servicing LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Reply of petitioner Rick Greer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Rick Greer
Attorneys for Respondents
Clifford Scott Davidson
    Counsel of Record
Sussman Shank LLP
1000 SW Broadway Ave, Ste 1400
Portland, OR 97205

cdavidson@sussmanshank.com
(503) 227-1111
Party name: Green Tree Servicing LLC