No. 17-1349
Title:Randy Johnson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 26, 2018
Linked with 17A716
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1366)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2018Application (17A716) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2018 to March 26, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 05 2018Application (17A716) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 26, 2018.
Mar 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2018 to May 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 25, 2018.
Apr 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Howard Uninversity School of Law Civil and Human Rights Clinic filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Fourth Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 25, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 25, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Randy Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-5600
Party name: Fourth Amendment Scholars
Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law
2900 Van Ness St., NW
Washington, DC 20008

ajmel.quereshi@law.howard.edu
202-216-5574
Party name: Howard Uninversity School of Law Civil and Human Rights Clinic
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
202-842-0200
Party name: The Cato Institute