No. 17-1343
Title:Shawn Labarron Davis, aka Shawn Davis, aka Shawn L. Davis, aka Shawn Labarren Davis, aka Shawn Labarum Davis, Petitioner
v.
Mississippi
Docketed:March 23, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2016-CT-00638-SCT)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 23 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Mississippi to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 16 2018Response Requested. (Due May 16, 2018)
Apr 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of Fair Punishment Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2018Brief amicus curiae of Juvenile Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2018 to June 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 15, 2018.
May 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Phillips Black Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 13 2018Brief of respondent State of Mississippi in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2018Reply of petitioner Shawn Labarron Davis filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
3125030711
Party name: Shawn Labarron Davis
Attorneys for Respondent
Katy Taylor Gerber
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General State of Mississippi
Post Office Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205

kgerb@ago.state.ms.us
601-359-3651
Party name: State of Mississippi
Other
Sharon Katz
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardwell
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

sharon.katz@davispolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: Fair Punishment Project
Marsha Levick
    Counsel of Record
Juvenile Law Center
1315 Walnut Street, 4th Fl.
Philadelphia, PA 19107

mlevick@jlc.org
215-625-0551
Party name: Juvenile Law Center
John Robert Mills
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Black
836 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107

j.mills@phillipsblack.org
888-532-0897
Party name: Phillips Black Project