No. 17-133
Vide 17-118
Title:Alaska Oil and Gas Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Wilbur L. Ross, Secretary of Commerce, et al.
Docketed:July 27, 2017
Linked with 16A1105
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-35806, 14-35811)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 11 2017Application (16A1105) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2017 to July 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
May 12 2017Application (16A1105) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 22, 2017.
Jul 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2017)
Aug 18 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 27, 2017, for all respondents.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Resource Development Council for Alaska, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Sep 22 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 27, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 26 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 27 2017Brief of respondent Center for Biological Diversity in opposition filed. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ryan Perry Steen
    Counsel of Record
Stoel Rives LLP
600 University Street, Suite 3600
Seattle, WA 98101

ryan.steen@stoel.com
206-386-7610
Party name: Alaska Oil and Gas Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilbur L. Ross, Secretary of Commerce, et al.
Kassia Rhoades Siegel
    Counsel of Record
Center for Biological Diversity
1212 Broadway, Ste. 800
Oakland, CA 94612

ksiegel@biologicaldiversity.org
(510) 844-7100
Party name: Center for Biological Diversity
Other
Matthew Todd Findley
    Counsel of Record
Ashburn & Mason, P.C.
1227 W. Ninth Avenue, Suite 200
Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

matt@anchorlaw.com
(907)-276-4331
Party name: Resource Development Council for Alaska, Inc., et al.