No. 17-1320
Title:Sean Garvin, Petitioner
v.
New York
Docketed:March 20, 2018
Linked with 17A689
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(82)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 26 2017Application (17A689) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2018 to March 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Application (17A689) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until March 23, 2018.
Mar 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Waiver of right of respondent New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018Brief amici curiae of Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 19 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 08 2018Response Requested. (Due June 7, 2018)
Jun 06 2018Brief of respondent New York in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 19 2018Reply of petitioner Sean Garvin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: Sean Garvin
Attorneys for Respondent
John M. Castellano
    Counsel of Record
125-01 Queens Boulevard
Kew Gardens, NY 11415

jmcastellano@queensda.org
718-286-5801
Party name: New York
Other
Clifton S. Elgarten
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

celgarten@crowell.com
202-624-2500
Party name: Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice, et al.
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
617-526-6000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.