No. 17-132
Title:James Lindsey, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:July 27, 2017
Linked with 16A1217
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(151111)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 24, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2017Application (16A1217) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 22, 2017 to July 24, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 14 2017Application (16A1217) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 24, 2017.
Jul 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2017)
Jul 31 2017Waiver of right of respondent Virginia to respond filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 17 2017Response Requested. (Due September 18, 2017)
Sep 05 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 18, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William M. Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

wjay@goodwinlaw.com
(202) 346-4000
Party name: James Lindsey
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Robert McGuire
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mmcguire@oag.state.va.us
804-786-7773
Party name: Virginia