No. 17-1316
Title:Sportswear, Inc., dba Prep Sportswear, Petitioner
v.
Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc.
Docketed:March 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-13830)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Waiver of right of respondent Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc. to respond filed.
May 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 03 2018Response Requested. (Due June 4, 2018)
May 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 4, 2018 to July 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2018.
Jul 05 2018Brief of respondent Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Reply of petitioner Sportswear, Inc., d/b/a Prep Sportswear filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Sportswear, Inc., d/b/a Prep Sportswear
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc.