No. 17-1314 | |
Title: | Mohsin Raza, et al., Petitioners v. United States |
Docketed: | March 19, 2018 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-4247, 16-4259, 16-4261, 16-4262) |
Decision Date: | November 20, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 18, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 15 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 18, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 10 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2018 to May 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 11 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2018. |
May 18 2018 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
Certificate of Word CountMain Document | |
Jun 05 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018. |
Jun 05 2018 | Reply of petitioners Mohsin Raza, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 25 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Lisa Schiavo Blatt Counsel of Record | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP 601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 lisa.blatt@arnoldporter.com | 202-679-5257 |
Party name: Mohsin Raza, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |