No. 17-1307
Title:Dennis Obduskey, Petitioner
v.
McCarthy & Holthus LLP
Docketed:March 15, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1330)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2018 to May 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2018.
May 16 2018Brief of respondents McCarthy & Holthus LLP, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2018Waiver of the 14-Day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
May 30 2018Reply of petitioner Dennis Obduskey filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 16 2018Joint motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 23 2018Joint motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 10, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 7, 2018.
Aug 08 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Dennis Obduskey.
Blanket Consent
Sep 04 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, McCarthy & Holthus LLP, et al..
Blanket Consent
Sep 10 2018Brief of petitioner Dennis Obduskey filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, INC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Consumer Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of Michigan Creditors Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 07 2018Brief of respondent McCarthy & Holthus LLP filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Creditors Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Amicus brief of Legal League 100 not accepted for filing. (November 15, 2018) (Duplicate submission)
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Colorado Mortgage Lenders Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2018Brief amici curiae of United Trustee's Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 14 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Legal League 100 filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Commercial Law League of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of USFN - America's Mortgage Banking Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amici curiae of Mortgage Bankers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, January 7, 2019
Nov 30 2018CIRCULATED
Dec 03 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Dec 07 2018Reply of petitioner Dennis Obduskey filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Dennis Obduskey
Attorneys for Respondent
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: McCarthy & Holthus LLP
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: UNITED STATES
Michelle Garcia Gilbert
    Counsel of Record
Gilbert Garcia Group, P.A.
2313 West Violet Street
Tampa, FL 33603

mgilbert@gilbertgrouplaw.com
813-638-8920
Party name: Legal League 100
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Members of Congress
Richard Peter Haber
    Counsel of Record
McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
420 Lexington Avenue, Suite 840
New York, NY 10170

rich.haber@mccalla.com
(347) 286-7409
Party name: USFN - America's Mortgage Banking Attorneys
Dean T. Kirby Jr.
    Counsel of Record
KIRBY & McGUIN APC
707 BROADWAY
STE 1750
SAN DIEGO, CA 92101

dkirby@kirbymac.com
6195251652
Party name: United Trustee's Association
Kathleen H. Klaus
    Counsel of Record
Maddin Hauser Roth and Heller PC
28400 Northwestern Highway
Suite 300
Southfield, MI 48034

kklaus@maddinhauser.com
248-359-7520
Party name: Michigan Creditors Bar Association
Tomio Buck Narita
    Counsel of Record
Simmonds & Narita LLP
44 Montgomery Street
Suite 3010
San Francisco, CA 94104

tnarita@snllp.com
4155196093
Party name: National Creditors Bar Association
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Mortgage Bankers Association, American Bankers Association, Bank Policy Institute, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, and Western Bankers Association
Stuart Todd Rossman
    Counsel of Record
The National Consumer Law Center
7 Winthrop Square, Fourth Floor
Boston, MA 02110

srossman@nclc.org
617-542-8010
Party name: The National Consumer Law Center
Stephen W. Sather
    Counsel of Record
Barron & Newburger, P.C.
7320 N. MoPac Expy.
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78731

ssather@bn-lawyers.com
5124769103
Party name: THE COMMERCIAL LAW LEAGUE OF AMERICA
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street, 5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

sspital@naacpldf.org
212-965-2200
Party name: NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC
Deanne Renee StoddenMessner Reeves, LLP
1430 Wynkoop Street, Suite 300
Denver, CO 80202

dstodden@messner.com
303-623-1800
Party name: Colorado Mortgage Lenders Association