No. 17-1304
Title:Ivan Bernabe Rodriguez Vazquez, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:March 15, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-60211)
   Decision Date:February 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 16, 2018)
Mar 09 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Mar 26 2018Letter of March 26, 2018, from counsel for petitioner received informing the Court of the issuance of a substitute opinion in this case by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Apr 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2018 to May 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Apr 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 16, 2018.
May 16 2018Brief of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Jun 04 2018Reply of petitioner Ivan Bernabe Rodriguez Vasquez filed.
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212) 506-5000
Party name: Ivan Bernabe Rodriguez Vasquez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General