No. 17-1302
Vide 17-1300
Title:Nomura Securities International, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Housing Finance Agency
Docketed:March 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1872-cv, 15-1874-cv)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2018
Apr 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2018 to May 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 22, 2018.
May 18 2018Brief of respondent Federal Housing Finance Agency in opposition filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 04 2018Reply of petitioners Nomura Securities International, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Nomura Securities International, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Other
Michael John Dell
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mdell@kramerlevin.com
212-715-9100
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association