No. 17-1301
Title:Ryan Harvey, et al., Petitioners
v.
UTE Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation, et al.
Docketed:March 14, 2018
Linked with 17A743
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Utah
   Case Numbers:(20160362)
   Decision Date:November 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2018Application (17A743) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2018 to March 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Application (17A743) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 7, 2018.
Mar 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 30 2018Letter from counsel for respondents Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation, et al. submitted.
Main Document
Apr 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2018, for all respondents.
Apr 13 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Utah filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2018 to June 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 06 2018Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioner Ryan Harvey, et al. filed.
Main Document
May 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including May 21, 2018, for all respondents.
May 21 2018Brief of respondents Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation; et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 05 2018Reply of petitioners Ryan Harvey, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park LLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Ryan Harvey, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel S. Press
    Counsel of Record
Van Ness Feldman
1050 Thomas Jefferson St., NW
Seventh Floor
Washington, DC 20007

dsp@vnf.com
2022981882
Party name: Dino Ray Cesspooch, in his individual capacity; Jackie LaRose, in his individual capacity; Sheila Wopsock, in her individual capacity; D. Ray C. Enterprises, LLC; and LaRose Construction Company, Inc.
Jeffrey Scott Rasmussen
    Counsel of Record
Fredericks Peebles & Morgan LLP
1900 Plaza Drive
Louisville, CO 80027

jrasmussen@ndnlaw.com
303-673-9600
Party name: Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation; et al.
Other
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: State of Utah