No. 17-1300
Vide 17-1302
Title:David Findlay, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Housing Finance Agency
Docketed:March 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1872-cv, 15-1874-cv)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2018 to May 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 22, 2018.
May 18 2018Brief of respondent Federal Housing Finance Agency in opposition filed. VIDED
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 04 2018Reply of petitioners David Findlay, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David B. Tulchin
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

tulchind@sullcrom.com
212-558-4000
Party name: David Findlay, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Housing Finance Agency