No. 17-130
Title:Raymond J. Lucia, et al., Petitioners
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:July 26, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1345)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 25, 2017)
Jul 28 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Raymond J. Lucia, et al. on 07/31/2017
Aug 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 25, 2017.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Mark Cuban filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Sep 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 25, 2017.
Sep 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed.
Oct 17 2017Letter of October 17, 2017 from counsel for petitioners received.
Oct 18 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 15, 2017.
Nov 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2017 to November 29, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2017.
Nov 29 2017Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 13 2017Reply of petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jan 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Raymond J. Lucia, et al..
Blanket Consent
Jan 18 2018Anton Metlitsky, Esquire, of New York, New York, is invited to brief and argue this case, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below.
Jan 26 2018Letter of petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al. on behalf of the parties filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2018The joint appendix, petitioners' brief on the merits, and brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission shall be filed on or before February 21, 2018. Any amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners or in support of neither party shall be filed on or before February 28, 2018.
Feb 07 2018The brief of Court-Appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below shall be filed on or before March 26, 2018. Any other amicus curiae brief supporting affirmance (the judgment below) shall be filed on or before April 2, 2018.
Feb 07 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Securities and Exchange Commission
Blanket Consent
Feb 08 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Feb 21 2018Brief of petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Amicus brief of Anthony Michael Sabino submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 23, 2018.
Feb 23 2018Amicus brief of SHOW, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Raymond J. Lucia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
Other
Gerald Marvin Bober
    Counsel of Record
3909 Long Trail Way
Reisterstown, MD 21136

judginator@gmail.com
4108336303
Party name: The Forum of United States Administrative Law Judges
Rowland David Broiles
    Counsel of Record
David Broiles
2400 Indian Cove
Fort Worth, TX 76108

davidbroiles@gmail.com
817-246-7801
Party name: SHOW, Inc.
Oliver J. Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

odunford@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Alex Lipman
    Counsel of Record
Brown Rudnick, LLP
Seven Times Square
Seven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

alipman@brownrudnick.com
212-209-4800
Party name: Mark Cuban
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in suport of the judgment below
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States
Anthony Michael Sabino
    Counsel of Record
Sabino & Sabino, P.C.
92 Willis Avenue, 2nd Floor
Mineola, NY 11501

anthony.sabino@sabinolaw.com
516-294-3199
Party name: Anthony Michael Sabino
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute