No. 17-1299
Title:Franchise Tax Board of California, Petitioner
v.
Gilbert P. Hyatt
Docketed:March 14, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nevada
   Case Numbers:(53264)
   Decision Date:December 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2018Waiver of right of respondent Gilbert P. Hyatt to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 10 2018Letter of April 10, 2018 from counsel for petitioner received.
Apr 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Multistate Tax Commission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana and 44 other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 01 2018Response Requested. (Due May 31, 2018)
May 31 2018Brief of respondent Gilbert P. Hyatt in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2018Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 06 2018Reply of petitioner Franchise Tax Board of the State of California filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 03 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Franchise Tax Board of the State of California.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 18 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 11, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 15, 2018.
Aug 24 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Sep 06 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Franchise Tax Board of the State of California.
Blanket Consent
Sep 07 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Gilbert P. Hyatt.
Blanket Consent
Sep 11 2018Brief of petitioner Franchise Tax Board of the State of California filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Alan B. Morrison & Darien Shanske in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Multistate Tax Commission, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana and 43 other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of James C. Giudici in support of neither party filed.
Sep 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors William Baude and Stephen E. Sachs in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief of Gilbert P. Hyatt submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Franchise Tax Board of the State of California
Attorneys for Respondent
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana and 43 other States
Helen Hecht
    Counsel of Record
Multistate Tax Commission
444 N. Capitol St., NW
Ste 425
Washington, DC 20001

hhecht@mtc.gov
202-650-0300
Party name: Multistate Tax Commission
James Carl Giudici
    Counsel of Record
6128 Torrington Drive
reno, NV 89511

jiminreno@gmail.com
7758258151
Party name: James C. Giudici
Benjamin L. Hatch
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
2001 K Street NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006-1040

bhatch@mcguirewoods.com
757 630 3727
Party name: Law Professors
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Alan B. Morrison & Darien Shanske
Stephen Edward Sachs
    Counsel of Record
Duke University School of Law
210 Science Drive
Box 90360
Durham, NC 27708-0360

sachs@law.duke.edu
919-613-8542
Party name: William Baude & Stephen E. Sachs