No. 17-1286
Vide 17-1290
Title:National Mining Association, Petitioner
v.
Ryan Zinke, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Docketed:March 13, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-17350)
   Decision Date:December 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018Brief of respondent Gregory Yount in support filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2018Brief amici curiae of Arizona Mining Association, et al. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of ServiceProof of Service
Apr 12 2018Waiver of right of respondent Ryan Zinke, Secretary of the Interior, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 03 2018Response Requested. (Due June 4, 2018)
May 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 4, 2018 to July 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2018, for all respondents.
Jun 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2018 to July 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 31, 2018, for all respondents.
Jul 31 2018Brief of respondents Grand Canyon Trust, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Brief of respondents Ryan Zinke, Secretary of the Interior, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 13 2018Reply of petitioner National Mining Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
R. Timothy McCrum
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

rmccrum@crowell.com
(202) 624-2500
Party name: National Mining Association
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Ryan Zinke, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jmccoy@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Gregory Yount
Edward Breckenridge Zukoski
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
633 17th Street, Suite 1600
Denver, CO 80202

tzukoski@earthjustice.org
3039969622
Party name: Grand Canyon Trust, et al.
Other
Caroline Coppock Lobdell
    Counsel of Record
Western Resources Legal Center
9220 SW Barbur Blvd
Suite 327
Portland, OR 97219

clobdell@wrlegal.org
503-768-8500
Party name: Arizona Mining Association, et al.