No. 17-1284
Title:Jonathan Apodaca, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rick Raemisch, et al.
Docketed:March 13, 2018
Linked with 17A651
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1454)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 10, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2017Application (17A651) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 8, 2018 to March 9, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 19 2017Application (17A651) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 9, 2018.
Mar 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2018Waiver of right of respondents Rick Raemisch, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Mar 28 2018Response Requested. (Due April 27, 2018)
Apr 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 27, 2018 to June 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 22, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel M. Greenfield
    Counsel of Record
MacArthur Justice Center
Northwestern Pritzker School of Law
375 E. Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL 60611-3069

daniel-greenfield@law.northwestern.edu
(312) 503-8538
Party name: Jonathan Apodaca , et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Frederick Richard Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Department of Law
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway, 9th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

fred.yarger@coag.gov
7205086168
Party name: Rick Raemisch, et al.