No. 17-1272
Title:Henry Schein, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Docketed:March 12, 2018
Linked with 17A859
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41674)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2018Application (17A859) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2018Response to application (17A859) requested by Justice Alito, due Wednesday, February 21, by 3 p.m. ET.
Feb 21 2018Response to application from respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Reply of applicant Henry Schein, Inc., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Application (17A859) referred to the Court.
Mar 02 2018The application (17A859) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, case No. 2:12-cv-572, are stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.
Mar 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2018 to May 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2018.
May 11 2018Brief of respondent Archer and White Sales, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
May 29 2018Reply of petitioners Henry Schein, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 02 2018Joint motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 13 2018Joint motion to extend the time to file opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 14, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 18, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Henry Schein, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lewis T. LeClair
    Counsel of Record
McKool Smith
300 Cresent Court
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
214-978-4984
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.