No. 17-1268
Vide 17-1236, 17-1406
Title:Monicah Okoba Opati, In Her Own Right, as Executrix of the Estate of Caroline Setla Opati, Deceased, et al., Petitioners
v.
Republic of Sudan, et al.
Docketed:March 9, 2018
Linked with 17A680
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-7124, 14-7125, 14-7127, 14-7128)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2017Application (17A680) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2018 to March 2, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Application (17A680) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 2, 2018.
Mar 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 09 2018Brief of respondents Republic of Sudan, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2018Reply of petitioners Monicah Okoba Opati, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Steven Robert Perles
    Counsel of Record
Perles Law Firm, PC
1050 Connecticut Avenue
N.W., Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

sperles@perleslaw.com
2029559055
Party name: Monicah Okoba Opati, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher M. Curran
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

ccurran@whitecase.com
202- 626 -3600
Party name: Republic of Sudan, et al.