No. 17-1251
Title:Charles H. Casey, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2368)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2018)
PetitionOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2018 to May 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 9, 2018
Apr 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2018 to May 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 25, 2018.
May 22 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: Charles H. Casey, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States