No. 17-1247
Title:Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Petitioner
v.
Richard E. Jackson, et al.
Docketed:March 7, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3120)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 18, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018, for all respondents.
May 07 2018Brief of respondent Sierra N. Jackson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Reply of petitioner Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5600
Party name: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Attorneys for Respondents
James David Brookshire
    Counsel of Record
Dungan & LeFevre Co., LPA
210 West Main Street
Troy, OH 45373

jamesb@dunganattorney.com
937-339-0511
Party name: Sierra N. Jackson