No. 17-1241
Title:Corey Dewayne Williams, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:March 6, 2018
Linked with 17A725
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(50702-KW)
   Decision Date:May 16, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 27, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2018Application (17A725) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2018 to March 12, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 09 2018Application (17A725) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 23, 2018.
Feb 12 2018Application (17A725) to extend further the time from February 23, 2018 to March 25, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Application (17A725) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 26, 2018.
Mar 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Innocence Project New Orleans.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Fair Punishment Project, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Former Prosecutors and Department of Justice Officials.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Louisiana to respond filed.
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 16 2018Response Requested. (Due May 16, 2018)
Apr 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2018 to June 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 15, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir Hatem Mahdy Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Corey Dewayne Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
Colin Andrew Clark
    Counsel of Record
Louisiana State Attorney General's Office
Louisiana State Attorney General's Office
1885 N. Third Street, PO Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

clarkc@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6200
Party name: Louisiana
Suzanne M. Williams
    Counsel of Record
Caddo Parish District Attorney's Office
501 Texas St., 5th Floor
Shreveport, LA 71101

318-429-7618
Party name: State of Louisiana
Other
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection, Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: Former Prosecutors and Department of Justice Officials
Justin Matthew Sher
    Counsel of Record
Sher Tremonte, LLP
90 Broad Street, 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10004

jsher@shertremonte.com
212-202-2600
Party name: The Fair Punishment Project, et al.
Sara E. Silva
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
100 High Street
20th Floor
Boston, MA 02110

sara.silva@hoganlovells.com
617-371-1461
Party name: Innocence Project New Orleans