No. 17-1233
Title:Emilio Estrada, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5081)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2018 to May 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 4, 2018.
May 04 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 21 2018Reply of petitioner Emilio Estrada filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark C. Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6000
Party name: Emilio Estrada
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States