No. 17-1229
Title:Helsinn Healthcare S.A., Petitioner
v.
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1284, 2016-1787)
   Decision Date:May 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 16, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2018 to May 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2018.
Mar 13 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Helsinn Healthcare S.A..
Blanket Consent
Mar 19 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Mar 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Congressman Lamar Smith filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Bar Association of the District of Columbia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Naples Roundtable filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Boston Patent Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Massachusetts Biotechnology Council filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Biotechnology Innovation Organization (BIO) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of US Inventor, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2018Brief of respondents Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
May 29 2018Reply of petitioner Helsinn Healthcare S.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 02 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 23, 2018. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 9, 2018.
Aug 01 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Helsinn Healthcare S.A..
Blanket Consent
Aug 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Brief of petitioner Helsinn Healthcare S.A. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Congressman Lamar Smith filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Massachusetts Biotechnology Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Bar Association of the District of Columbia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Austin Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Houston Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Naples Roundtable in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Biotechnology Innovation Organization (BIO) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of US Inventor, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 4, 2018
Oct 09 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of 45 Intellectual Property Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief of respondents Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Oct 15 2018Brief amici curiae of R Street Institute and Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Congresswoman Zoe Lofgren filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of IEEE-USA filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Brief amici curiae of SPCM S.A. and High Tech Inventors Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Oct 19 2018CIRCULATED
Oct 24 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of some confidential documents (1 Envelope).
Nov 08 2018Reply of petitioner Helsinn Healthcare S.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Helsinn Healthcare S.A.
Attorneys for Respondents
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.
Steffen Nathanael JohnsonWinston & Strawn LLP
1700 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@winston.com
(202) 282-5879
Party name: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.
Other
Robert A. Armitage
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
320 Seaview Court
Marco Island, FL 34145

raarmitage@aol.com
(703) 801-6334
Party name: Congressman Lamar Smith
Ronald Edmund Cahill
    Counsel of Record
Nutter McClennen & Fish LLP
155 Seaport Blvd
Boston, MA 02210

rcahill@nutter.com
617-439-2782
Party name: Boston Patent Law Association
Kathleen B. Carr
    Counsel of Record
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111

kbcarr@mintz.com
617-542-6000
Party name: US Inventor, Inc.
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mjdowd@dowdpllc.com
202-573-3853
Party name: The Naples Roundtable
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Robert M. Isackson
    Counsel of Record
Leason Ellis LLP
One Barker Avenue
Fifth Floor
White Plains, NY 10601

isackson@leasonellis.com
914-821-1618
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
Scott Ethan Kamholz
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

skamholz@cov.com
202-662-5339
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
William F. Lawrence
    Counsel of Record
Haug Partners LLP
745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10151

wlawrence@haugpartners.com
212-588-0800
Party name: Bar Association of the District of Columbia
Mark A. Lemley
    Counsel of Record
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

mlemley@law.stanford.edu
650-723-4605
Party name: 45 Intellectual Property Professors
Alice O. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4400
Chicago, IL 60606

alice.martin@btlaw.com
312-357-1313
Party name: The Biotechnology Innovation Organization (BIO)
Lynn Campbell Tyler
    Counsel of Record
Barnes & Thornburg
11 S. Meridian St.
Indianapolis, IN 46204

lynn.tyler@btlaw.com
317-231-7392
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Sophie Feifei Wang
    Counsel of Record
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
Two International Place
Boston, MA 02110

swang@choate.com
617-248-4052
Party name: The Massachusetts Biotechnology Council
Iftikhar Ahmed
    Counsel of Record
Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing, P.C.
1221 McKinney Street, Suite 2500
Houston, TX 77010

iftiahmed@azalaw.com
713-655-1101
Party name: Houston Intellectual Property Law Association
Boris Bershteyn
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
4 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

boris.bershteyn@skadden.com
212-735-3000
Party name: Intel Corporation
James Wilson Dabney
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
One New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

james.dabney@hugheshubbard.com
2128376800
Party name: SPCM S.A. AND HIGH TECH INVENTORS ALLIANCE
Stephen Roger Dartt
    Counsel of Record
Meyertons, Hood, Kivlin, Kowert & Goetzel, P.C.
1120 S. Capital of Texas Hwy.,
Building 2, Suite 300
West Lake Hills, TX 78746-6419

sdartt@intprop.com
5128538800
Party name: Austin Intellectual Property Law Association
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
2028610020
Party name: R Street Institute and Engine Advocacy
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines
Jonathan Alan HerstoffHaug Partners LLP
745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10151

jherstoff@haugpartners.com
212-588-0800
Party name: Bar Association of the District of Columbia
Maura Kathleen Moran
    Counsel of Record
Cambridge Technology Law, LLC
686 Massachusetts Avenue
Suite 201
Cambridge, MA 02139

mmoran@cambridgetechlaw.com
9784434558
Party name: IEEE-USA
John Caviness O'Quinn
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 15th St. NW
Washington, DC 20005

john.oquinn@kirkland.com
202-879-5191
Party name: Congresswoman Zoe Lofgren
Charles W. Shifley
    Counsel of Record
BANNER & WITCOFF, LTD.
10 South Wacker Drive
Suite 3000
Chicago, IL 60606

cshifley@bannerwitcoff.com
312-463-5000
Party name: THE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW ASSOCIATION OF CHICAGO