No. 17-1225
Title:Amy P. Campanelli, Petitioner
v.
Illinois
Docketed:March 1, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Illinois
   Case Numbers:(120997)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Illinois to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 09 2018Response Requested. (Due April 9, 2018)
Mar 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2018 to May 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 9, 2018
Apr 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Legal Ethics Scholars: Professor Vivien Gross, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2018Brief of respondent State of Illinois in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clifford Warren Berlow
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

cberlow@jenner.com
312-840-7366
Party name: Amy P. Campanelli
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Marc Glick
    Counsel of Record
Illinois Attorney General's Office
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

mglick@atg.state.il.us
3128142232
Party name: State of Illinois
Other
Sarah Lily Rosenbluth
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
500 Boylston Street
Boston, MA 02116

sarah.rosenbluth@skadden.com
617-573-4873
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Joshua G. Vincent
    Counsel of Record
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
222 North LaSalle Street
Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60601

jvincent@hinshawlaw.com
312-704-3000
Party name: Legal Ethics Scholars: Professor Vivien Gross, et al.