No. 17-1222
Title:Multnomah County, Oregon, Petitioner
v.
David Updike, et al.
Docketed:March 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-35254)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2018)
PetitionPetitionPetitionPetition
Mar 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2018 to May 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2018.
Apr 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2018 to June 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 1, 2018.
Jun 01 2018Brief of respondent David Updike in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 15 2018Reply of petitioner Multnomah County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacqueline Sadker Kamins
    Counsel of Record
Multnomah County Attorney
501 SE Hawthorne Blvd., Suite 500
Portland, OR 97214

jacqueline.kamins@multco.us
5039883138
Party name: Multnomah County
Attorneys for Respondent
Carl Lee Post
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Daniel Snyder
1000 SW Broadway, Ste 2400
Portland, OR 97205

carlpost@lawofficeofdanielsnyder.com
5032413617
Party name: David Updike