No. 17-1210 | |
Title: | Lisa Anne Henry, et al., Petitioners v. Brian Weiss, Liquidation Trustee of the Walldesign Liquidating Trust, Successor in Interest to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Walldesign, Inc. |
Docketed: | March 1, 2018 |
Linked with 17A760 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-56220, 15-56221) |
Decision Date: | October 2, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 9, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 17 2018 | Application (17A760) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 7, 2018 to February 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Jan 19 2018 | Application (17A760) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 28, 2018. |
Feb 28 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 19 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2018 to May 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2018. |
Apr 24 2018 | Brief of respondent Brian Weiss in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 08 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018. |
May 08 2018 | Reply of petitioners Lisa Anne Henry, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 29 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Kannon K. Shanmugam Counsel of Record | Williams & Connolly LLP 725 Twelfth Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20005 kshanmugam@wc.com | (202) 434-5000 |
Party name: Lisa Anne Henry, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Shay Dvoretzky Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Avenue NW Washington, DC 20001-2113 sdvoretzky@jonesday.com | 202-879-3939 |
Party name: Brian Weiss |