No. 17-1201
Title:Gary Thacker, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Tennessee Valley Authority
Docketed:February 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15105)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 29, 2018)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServicePetitionAppendix
Mar 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2018 to April 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2018.
Apr 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2018 to May 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 30, 2018.
May 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 30, 2018 to June 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 29, 2018.
Jun 29 2018Brief of respondent Tennessee Valley Authority in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 13 2018Reply of petitioner Gary Thacker, et ux filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 27 2018Petition GRANTED.
Sep 28 2018The order granting the petition for a writ of certiorari is amended as follows: The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Nov 13 2018Brief of petitioners Gary Thacker, et ux filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Nov 28 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, January 14, 2019
Nov 30 2018CIRCULATED
Dec 11 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Dec 13 2018Brief of respondent Tennessee Valley Authority filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Dec 26 2018Record from the U.S.D.C. Northern Dist. of Alabama is electronic and located on the District courts web site.
Jan 04 2019Reply of petitioners Gary Thacker, et ux filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2019Argued. For petitioners: Franklin Taylor Rouse, Huntsville, Ala. For respondent: Ann O'Connell Adams, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Franklin Taylor Rouse
    Counsel of Record
Conchin, Cloud & Cole, LLC
2404 Commerce Court, S.W.
Huntsville, AL 35801

taylor@conchincloudcole.com
256-705-7777
Party name: Gary Thacker, et ux
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Tennessee Valley Authority