No. 17-1189 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Jorge Avila Torrez, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | February 23, 2018 |
Linked with 17A567 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (14-1) |
Decision Date: | August 28, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 25, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 21 2017 | Application (17A567) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 24, 2017 to February 22, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 30 2017 | Application (17A567) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 22, 2018. |
Feb 22 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018. |
Apr 10 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2018 to May 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 11 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 25, 2018. |
May 15 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 25, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 16 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 25, 2018. |
Jun 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2018 to July 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 22 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 25, 2018. |
Jul 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jul 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 24, 2018. |
Aug 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 24, 2018. |
Sep 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 24, 2018. |
Oct 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2018 to December 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 24 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 13, 2018. |
Dec 12 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2018 to January 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 13 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 14, 2019. |
Jan 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2019 to March 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is furhter extended to and including March 7, 2019. |
Mar 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2019 to April 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 8, 2019. |
Apr 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Apr 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2019. |
May 08 2019 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 28 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019. |
May 28 2019 | Reply of petitioner Jorge Avila Torrez filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 17 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Danielle Mary Spinelli Counsel of Record | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20006 danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com | (202) 663-6000 |
Party name: Jorge Avila Torrez | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |