No. 17-1184
Title:Michael J. Biestek, Petitioner
v.
Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Docketed:February 23, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1459)
   Decision Date:December 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court’s Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system.
Feb 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018.
Apr 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 14, 2018.
Apr 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2018 to May 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
May 14 2018Brief of respondent Nancy A. Berryhill, Deputy Commissioner for Operations, Social Security Administration in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2018Reply of petitioner Michael J. Biestek filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jun 25 2018As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Jul 13 2018Joint motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 27, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 15, 2018.
Jul 13 2018Joint motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Michael J. Biestek.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 03 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Michael J. Biestek
Blanket Consent
Aug 27 2018Brief of petitioner Michael J. Biestek filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 04 2018Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Social Security Claimants' Representatives, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Disability Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Oct 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 4, 2018
Oct 15 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Oct 15 2018Brief of respondent Nancy A. Berryhill, Deputy Commissioner for Operations, Social Security Administration filed.
Oct 16 2018Brief of Nancy A. Berryhill, Deputy Commissioner for Operations, Social Security Administration submitted.
Main Document
Oct 19 2018CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: Michael J. Biestek
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Nancy A. Berryhill, Deputy Commissioner for Operations, Social Security Administration
Other
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz LLP
2001 M St NW, 10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

rkilaru@wilkinsonwalsh.com
2028474000
Party name: National Association of Disability Representatives
Lawrence David Rohlfing
    Counsel of Record
Law Off of Lawrence D. Rohlfing
12631 East Imperial Highway
Suite C-115
Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670

lawrence.rohlfing@rohlfinglaw.com
5628685886
Party name: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION OF SOCIAL SECURITY CLAIMANTS’ REPRESENTATIVES; AARP & AARP FOUNDATION