No. 17-1183
Title:Airline Service Providers Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Los Angeles World Airports, et al.
Docketed:February 23, 2018
Linked with 17A711
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55571, 15-55572)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2017Application (17A711) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 14, 2018 to February 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 05 2018Application (17A711) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 15, 2018.
Feb 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Airline Service Providers Association, et al..
Blanket Consent
Mar 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018.
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of International Air Transport Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word Count
Apr 25 2018Brief of respondents Los Angeles World Airports, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2018Reply of petitioners Airline Service Providers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Douglas Ward Hall
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

dwhall@jonesday.com
2028793939
Party name: Airline Service Providers Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott P. Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Anderson & Kreiger LLP
50 Milk Street
21st Floor
Boston, MA 02109

slewis@andersonkreiger.com
617-621-6560
Party name: Los Angeles World Airports, et al.
Other
Benjamin Joseph Horwich
    Counsel of Record
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
560 Mission St.
27th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

Ben.Horwich@mto.com
415 512-4000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: International Air Transport Association
Richard Pianka
    Counsel of Record
ATA Litigation Center
950 North Glebe Road, Suite 210
Arlington, VA 22203

rpianka@trucking.org
703 838-1889
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc.