No. 17-1180
Title:Union Pacific Railroad Company, Petitioner
v.
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Docketed:February 22, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3452)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018.
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2018 to May 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 21, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
J. Scott Ballenger
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite1000
Washington, DC 20004-0000

scott.ballenger@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Other
Rae Thiesfield Vann
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

rvann@ntlakis.com
202-629-5600
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance, et al.