No. 17-1179
Title:American Economy Insurance Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:February 22, 2018
Linked with 17A685
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(96)
   Decision Date:October 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2017Application (17A685) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Dec 28 2017Application (17A685) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 21, 2018.
Feb 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018.
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Amicus brief of Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, American Insurance Association, National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies, New York Insurance Association, Inc. not accepted for filing. (March 26, 2018)
Apr 25 2018Brief of State of New York, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: American Economy Insurance Co., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway
New York, NY 10271-0332

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York, et al.
Other
Robert David Helfand
    Counsel of Record
Pullman & Comley, LLC
90 State House Square
Hartford, CT 06103

rhelfand@pullcom.com
860-424-4348
Party name: Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, et al.
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation