No. 17-1175
Title:Poarch Band of Creek Indians, et al., Petitioners
v.
Casey Marie Wilkes, et al.
Docketed:February 22, 2018
Linked with 17A626
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(1151312)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2017Application (17A626) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2018 to February 1, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 12 2017Application (17A626) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 1, 2018.
Jan 18 2018Application (17A626) to extend further the time from February 1, 2018 to March 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jan 26 2018Application (17A626) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 2, 2018.
Feb 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2018Waiver of right of respondents CASEY WILKES, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Indian Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of United South and Eastern Tribes, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 05 2018Response Requested. (Due May 7, 2018)
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2018 to June 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 8, 2018.
Jun 08 2018Brief of respondent Casey Marie Wilkes, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 26 2018Reply of petitioners Poarch Band of Creek Indians, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7106
Party name: Poarch Band of Creek Indians, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael J. Crow
    Counsel of Record
Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, PC
PO Box 4160
Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

mike.crow@beasleyallen.com
3342692343
Party name: Casey Marie Wilkes, et al.
Other
Dan Himmelfarb
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Indian Law Scholars
Caroline Parnell Mayhew
    Counsel of Record
Hobbs Straus Dean & Walker LLP
2120 L St . NW. Suite 700
Washington, DC 20037

cmayhew@hobbsstraus.com
202-822-8282
Party name: United South and Eastern Tribes, Inc.