No. 17-1174
Title:Luis A. Nieves, et al., Petitioners
v.
Russell P. Bartlett
Docketed:February 22, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35631)
   Decision Date:October 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 12 2018Response Requested. (Due May 14, 2018)
May 14 2018Brief of respondent Russell P. Bartlett in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jul 25 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 20, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 2, 2018.
Aug 09 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Luis A. Nieves, et al..
Blanket Consent
Aug 20 2018Brief of petitioners Luis A. Nieves, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Joint appendix filed (1 volume). (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Motion to file volume II of the joint appendix under seal filed by respondent Russell P. Bartlett.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Joint appendix (volume II under sealed) filed . (Distributed)
Aug 24 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Russell P. Bartlett
Blanket Consent
Aug 27 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, International Municipal Lawyers Association, National Sheriffs’ Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Brief amici curiae of The District of Columbia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 02 2018Brief of respondent Russell P. Bartlett filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, November 26, 2018
Oct 09 2018Motion to file volume II of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of The First Amendment Foundation and Fane Lozman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Three Individual Activists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Free Speech filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of National Press Photographers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Oct 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of National Police Accountability Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2018Record requested from U.S.C.D. 9th Circuit.
Oct 18 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, also received are Restricted materials (1 Envelope).
Oct 18 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Central District of California (Western Division - Los Angeles) is electronic and located on PACER, also received are Restricted material that's electronic.
Oct 19 2018CIRCULATED
Oct 26 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 01 2018Reply of petitioners Luis A. Nieves, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Dario Borghesan
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska Department of Law
1031 W. Fourth Ave. Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

dario.borghesan@alaska.gov
(907) 269-5100
Party name: Luis A. Nieves, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Zane Dale Wilson
    Counsel of Record
CSG, Inc.
714 4th Ave., Suite 200
Fairbanks, AK 99707

zane@alaskalaw.com
9074521855
Party name: Russell P. Bartlett
Other
Floyd Abrams
    Counsel of Record
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
80 Pine Street
New York, NY 10005

fabrams@cahill.com
212-701-3000
Party name: Institute for Free Speech
Robert D. Balin
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP
1251 Avenue of the Americas, 21st FL
New York, NY 10020-1104

robertbalin@dwt.com
212-489-8230
Party name: National Press Photographers Association and 30 Media and Free Speech Organizations in support of Respondent
Erin Glenn Busby
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

egbusby@swbell.net
713-966-0409
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Michelle Otero Valdes
    Counsel of Record
Chalos & Co, P.C.
2030 S Douglas Road, Suite 117
Coral Gables, FL 33134

mov@chaloslaw.com
3053773700
Party name: Three Individual Activists
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
441 4th St., NW, Suite 630 South
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: The District of Columbia
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: The First Amendment Foundation and Fane Lozman
Bennett L. Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Polsinelli, PC
1401 Lawrence St.
Suite 2300
303-572-9300, CO 80202

bcohen@polsinelli.com
(303)-572-9300
Party name: National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, International Municipal Lawyers Association, National Sheriffs’ Association
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: Institute for Justice
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: National Police Accountability Project, Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center, American Civil Liberties Union, and ACLU Of Alaska