No. 17-1172
Title:Brendan Dassey, Petitioner
v.
Michael A. Dittmann
Docketed:February 22, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3397)
   Decision Date:December 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to May 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Michael A. Dittmann.
Blanket Consent
Feb 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 10, 2018.
Mar 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Brendan Dassey.
Blanket Consent
Mar 22 2018Brief amici curiae of Juvenile Law Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors of Criminal Law, Criminal Procedure, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Prosecutors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Independent Law Enforcement Instructors and Consultants filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Innocence Network filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Brendan Dassey
Attorneys for Respondent
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Dept. of Justice
17 W. Main Street
P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: Michael A. Dittmann
Other
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-6000
Party name: American Psychological Association, et al.
Gregory Bestor Craig
    Counsel of Record
1440 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washigton, DC 20005

gregory.craig@skadden.com
202- 371 -7000
Party name: Professors of Criminal Law, Criminal Procedure, et al.
Anthony J. Franze
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

Anthony.Franze@apks.com
202.942.5000
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors
Marsha Levick
    Counsel of Record
Juvenile Law Center
1315 Walnut Street, 4th Fl.
Philadelphia, PA 19107

mlevick@jlc.org
215-625-0551
Party name: Juvenile Law Center, et al.
Chris Lind
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck Herman etc.
54 West Hubbard Street
Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60654

chris.lind@bartlit-beck.com
(312) 494-4400
Party name: Innocence Network
Terri-Lynn Mascherin
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

Tmascherin@jenner.com
312-222-9350
Party name: Independent Law Enforcement Instructors and Consultants