No. 17-1165
Title:David L. de Csepel, et al., Petitioners
v.
Republic of Hungary, et al.
Docketed:February 21, 2018
Linked with 17A629
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-7042)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 4, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2017Application (17A629) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 2, 2018 to March 2, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 12 2017Application (17A629) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 2, 2018.
Feb 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2018 to April 23, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 23, 2018.
Mar 23 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Ambassador Stuart E. Eizenstat.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by AJC (Formally The American Jewish Committee), B'nai B'rith International, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2018 to May 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 21, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: David L. de Csepel, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sarah Erickson Andre
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
300 South Grand Avenue
Suite 4100
Los Angeles, CA 90071-3151

sandre@nixonpeabody.com
213-629-6000
Party name: Republic of Hungary, et al.
Other
Simon James Frankel
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One Front Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

sfrankel@cov.com
415-591-6000
Party name: Ambassador Stuart E. Eizenstat
Howard N. Spiegler
    Counsel of Record
Herrick, Feinstein LLP
2 Park Avenue
21st Floor
New York, NY 10016

hspiegler@herrick.com
212-592-1400
Party name: AJC (Formally The American Jewish Committee), B'nai B'rith International, et al.