No. 17-1154
Title:Calvin Coleman, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 16, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10233)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 06 2018Response Requested. (Due April 5, 2018)
Apr 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: Calvin Coleman
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America