No. 17-1152
Title:Contest Promotions, LLC, Petitioner
v.
City and County of San Francisco, California
Docketed:February 16, 2018
Linked with 17A672
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-16682)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2017Application (17A672) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2018 to February 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Application (17A672) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 14, 2018.
Feb 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Contest Promotions, LLC.
Blanket Consent
Feb 28 2018Waiver of right of respondent City and County of San Francisco to respond filed.
Mar 13 2018Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute and Mississippi Justice Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2018Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation and NFIB Small Business Legal Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Mar 23 2018Response Requested. (Due April 23, 2018)
Apr 23 2018Brief of City and County of San Francisco in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
560 Mission Street
27th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105

josh.patashnik@mto.com
415-512-4000
Party name: Contest Promotions, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
James M. Emery
    Counsel of Record
Office of the San Francisco City Attorney City Hall
One Drive Carlton B. Goodlett Place, Room 234
San Francisco, CA 94110

jim.emery@sfcityatty.org
415-554-4628
Party name: City and County of San Francisco
Other
Aditya Dynar
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
Goldwater Institute
500 East Coronado Road, AZ 85004

adynar@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute and Mississippi Justice Institute
Wencong Fa
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

wfa@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
2255 Sewell Mill Road, Suite 320
Marietta, GA 30062

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and NFIB Small Business Legal Center