No. 17-1142
Title:Michigan Gaming Control Board, et al., Petitioners
v.
John Moody, et al.
Docketed:February 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2244)
   Decision Date:September 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 14, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2018 to April 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 16, 2018.
Mar 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Michigan Municipal Risk Management Authority, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2018 to May 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 9, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Aaron David Lindstrom
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
525 West Ottawa Street, 7th Floor
Lansing, MI 48909

lindstroma@michigan.gov
517-241-8403
Party name: Michigan Gaming Control Board, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: John Moody, et al.
Other
Marcelyn A. Stepanski
    Counsel of Record
Johnson, Rosati, Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
27555 Executive Drive
Suite 250
Farmington Hills, MI 48331

mstepanski@jrsjlaw.com
248-489-4100
Party name: Michigan Municipal Risk Management Authority, et al.